THE SUNRISE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF INDIVIDUALS WHO SUFFER FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION AND/OR ARE DISADVANTAGED BY WAY OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION, POVERTY, NEGLECT, ABUSE OR DEPENDANCY (INC ALCOHOL OR DRUGS) BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO CHARITIES WORKING TO ADDRESS THESE CONDITIONS WITHIN COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,041,126
Donations and legacies | £1.00m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £40.98k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£502,495
Raising funds | £3.47k | |
Charitable activities | £499.03k | |
Other | £0 |
£78,762 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £499.03k | |
Retained for future use | £538.63k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £499.03k | |
Retained for future use | £617.39k |
People

1 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Peru
Governance
- 25 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Alastair Jeremy Greenhalgh | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Marta Glastonbury | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ben Glastonbury | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Salmons | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
BRYAN JOHN GLASTONBURY | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MAGGIE GLASTONBURY | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
SOPHIE BROOKE | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.57k | £295.14k | £149.56k | £38.65k | £1.04m | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.44k | £240.66k | £241.87k | £251.46k | £502.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £40.98k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £499.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £379.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £212.78k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.30m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £591.88k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CONSULTATION, THERAPY, WORK AND RECREATION; (B) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: I. THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; II. PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND (C) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS, EDUCATION AND SERVICES TO SUCH PEOPLE AND/OR TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION. 3.2 FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ÆSOCIALLY EXCLUDEDÆ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 GRANGE ROAD
CLIFTON
BRISTOL
BS8 4EA
- Phone:
- 07950809012
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window