THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF ECCLESHOLME BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 510151
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raises funds for the benefit of the residents at the Masonic Residential Home to provide in-house activities and take residents on out door trips as well as provide other amenities not supplied by the Royal Masonic Benevolent Institution .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021

Total income: £4,464
Total expenditure: £2,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Salford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1980: Standard registration
  • 05 September 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 05 September 2023: Funds transferred to 1175246 WEST LANCASHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITY
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £22.68k £25.61k £24.50k £18.72k £4.46k
Total expenditure £11.75k £14.56k £55.85k £17.27k £2.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 August 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 March 2022 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 August 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required