Financial history ELSWICK COMMUNITY POOL AND LEISURE CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1174227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £389.00k £554.01k £666.57k £796.84k £856.32k
Total expenditure £368.36k £483.83k £655.80k £688.41k £790.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £58.67k £214.10k £7.41k £3.43k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.09k £1.03k £773 £3.27k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £500.39k £665.54k £796.07k £853.05k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £52.53k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £483.83k £655.80k £688.41k £789.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £442
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £8.78k £540 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0