ELSWICK COMMUNITY POOL AND LEISURE CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1174227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting community participation in healthy recreation in Elswick and the adjoining areas, through provision of facilities to enable people to take part in swimming and other sports and activities capable of improving physical health and fitness.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 August 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HANNAH LOUISE MACKAY-CHRISTIE Chair 11 August 2017
None on record
JULIE BLACKIE Trustee 21 May 2024
NEWCASTLE THEATRE ROYAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Shazad Khan Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Helen Mary Dix Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Joanna Lesley Elson Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Niamh Michelle Cunningham Trustee 10 February 2020
THE NORTHUMBERLAND AND DURHAM FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
FERTILE GROUND DANCE LTD
Received: On time
DIANE FALLON TAIT Trustee 11 August 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £389.00k £554.01k £666.57k £796.84k £856.32k
Total expenditure £368.36k £483.83k £655.80k £688.41k £790.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £58.67k £214.10k £7.41k £3.43k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.09k £1.03k £773 £3.27k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £500.39k £665.54k £796.07k £853.05k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £52.53k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £483.83k £655.80k £688.41k £789.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £442
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £8.78k £540 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets N/A £78.12k £58.20k £55.93k £113.07k
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A £326.98k £371.40k £408.24k £369.14k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £147.58k £161.32k £87.45k £39.40k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 05 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 05 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 September 2021 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 September 2021 81 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Elswick Community Leisure Centre
Elswick Park
Beech Grove Road
Newcastle Upon Tyne
NE4 6RS
Phone:
01914814101
Website:

No information available