Financial history BRANDON HILL CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1173054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £16.45k £854 £30.54k £25.48k £33.33k
Total expenditure £13.83k £4.22k £32.87k £22.93k £26.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A