WHITE SWAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improvement of health of general public using technology and analytis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
129 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP KILLINGWORTH HEDGES | Chair | 02 January 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN DOMINIC CLIFT | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL CLIFT | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.12k | £190.80k | £244.68k | £217.85k | £196.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.07k | £147.44k | £172.08k | £218.31k | £227.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE IMPROVEMENT OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING TECHNOLOGICAL TOOLS AND ANALYTICAL RESEARCH TO HELP PREVENT ILL-HEALTH, ACCELERATE DIAGNOSIS AND IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF TREATMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Swan CIO
Blue Fin Building
Fora
1st Floor
110 Southwark Street
London
- Phone:
- 02034578539
- Email:
- hello@whiteswan.org.uk
- Website:
-
whiteswan.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window