SISTERS OF THE CHRISTIAN RETREAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sisters and the Retreat Team carry out the vision of the Founder, Father Anthony Receveur, in the House of Prayer. We offer Retreats, Spiritual Direction, Supervision and counselling.The Sisters provide personal and spiritual care in parishes and the House of Prayer without any restriction on beneficiaries. The congregation has an obligation to support its members throughout their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Benin
- France
- Ireland
Governance
- 03 August 2017: CIO registration
- 04 June 2018: Funds received from 232567 THE SISTERS OF THE CHRISTIAN RETREAT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister ANNE DUNNE | Chair | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Ellul | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA RUTH MASON | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Audrey Hamilton | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brijangana Waterfield | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mary Buckley | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Collins | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sister MELANIE M E KINGSTON | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.07k | £247.67k | £219.00k | £249.81k | £252.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £407.50k | £276.35k | £311.05k | £379.84k | £584.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2017 as amended on 19 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
The object of the CIO is the advancement of the Roman Catholic religion through such religious and other charitable work as the charity trustees shall from time to time think fit.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOUSE OF PRAYER
35 SEYMOUR ROAD
EAST MOLESEY
KT8 0PB
- Phone:
- 02089412313
- Email:
- anne@christian-retreat.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window