Trustees THE MUSEUM OF DARTMOOR LIFE

Charity Number: 1173111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Anne Pritchard Chair 19 May 2017
LEARN TO LIVE
Recently registered
Jonathan Stanley Gilpin Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Karren Munn Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Laura Caroline Bird Trustee 31 October 2023
INSPIRATION CHURCH OF THE NATIONS OKEHAMPTON
Received: 29 days late
GET CHANGED THEATRE COMPANY
Received: On time
SIMMONS HOMES
Received: On time
OKEHAMPTON STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Philip Hutt Trustee 02 November 2022
FOR THE LOVE OF A RAILWAY
Recently registered
Jo Rowse Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Jenna Marie Spellane Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
RICHARD JENNINGS Trustee 19 May 2017
None on record
Janet Goffey Trustee 19 May 2017
OKEHAMPTON DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT GROUP
Received: On time