DOG BREEDING REFORM GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards animals by providing and supporting initiatives to improve dog welfare based on breeding and rearing practices. To inform the general public about irresponsible dog breeding in order to make them aware of the potential impact on their dogs' health and welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 2017: Standard registration
- 04 August 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1195705 DOG BREEDING REFORM GROUP (DBRG)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | £6.59k | £6.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.58k | £4.39k | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 16 March 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOV 2015 DATED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING INITIATIVES TO IMPROVE DOG WELFARE RELATED TO: A) GENETIC AND BREED RELATED HEALTH, BREEDING REARING AND SELLING PRACTICES; AND B) TO INFORM THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT IRRESPONSIBLE DOG BREEDING IN ORDER TO MAKE THEM AWARE OF THE POTENTIAL IMPACT ON THEIR DOGS’ HEALTH AND WELFARE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window