LAKELAND HOUSING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of rented homes for local people who cannot afford to buy or long-term rent accommodation at current market rates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- LAKELAND HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
- LAKELAND HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
- LAKELAND HOUSING TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE LAKELAND HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Thomas Stafford Batten | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Eric Woodall | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire McKeever | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Blamire | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Johnston | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Law | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Richard Palin Dobson | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marjory Tomlinson | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Roger Bonham | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Diana Ruth Matthews | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|||||
JOHN HOLMES | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|||||
DOREEN ANNE HALL | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHARLES ROBERT ANDREW FLANAGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Helen Caldwell | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.64k | £842.38k | £1.01m | £756.44k | £471.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.64k | £149.09k | £155.55k | £181.06k | £255.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £136.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £636.69k | £644.37k | £427.37k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £136.82k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £205.69k | £231.88k | £245.72k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £83.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £636.69k | £0 | £427.01k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £155.55k | £181.06k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £149.09k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING TO THOSE UNABLE TO RENT OR BUY LOCALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cumbria Tourist Business Centre
Windermere Road
Staveley
KENDAL
Cumbria
LA8 9PL
- Phone:
- 01539721375
- Email:
- kendal@hhlandestates.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window