MANCHESTER TAMIL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children and young people aged 4-18 through the provision of education in Tamil language and fine arts including singing and classical dance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 06 March 2018: CIO registration
- Manchester Tamil school (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
arumaithurai senthilkumaran | Chair | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rasiah Kugan | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RECKEY COTILDA KEMANANTHAN | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUHARNA SUBRAMANIAM | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Senathirajah Ariyaratnam | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PREMA NAVANEETHARASA | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SANTHALINGAM JEGATHEESWARAN | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUPETHINI ARUMUHAM | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
VEERASINGAM KURALARASU | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KOILRAJ MOSES | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.98k | £469 | £1.12k | £3.37k | £3.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.49k | £1.48k | £1.17k | £2.60k | £4.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 4-18 THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN TAMIL LANGUAGE AND FINE ARTS INCLUDING SINGING AND CLASSICAL DANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Darnley Street
MANCHESTER
M16 9NE
- Phone:
- 07876705023
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window