FOLIO SUTTON COLDFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOLIO Sutton Coldfield stands for Friends Of Libraries In Our Sutton Coldfield. We facilitate educational and community-engaging events and programmes supporting Sutton Coldfield library services to ensure that public libraries in the town do not just survive, but thrive at the heart of our community. Our activities are largely financed by grant-making bodies and fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 November 2017: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF LIBRARIES IN OUR SUTTON COLDFIELD (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Shipway | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Farrell | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH PARRY | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|||||
NORAH-ANN FLYNN | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER JANE WILKINSON | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.43k | £16.81k | £22.20k | £2.13k | £179 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.84k | £5.33k | £30.88k | £2.98k | £1.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA SERVED BY PUBLIC LIBRARIES WHICH ARE BASED IN THE CONSTITUENCY OF SUTTON COLDFIELD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICS, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING THE CURRENT LIBRARY SERVICE IN SUTTON COLDFIELD; (B) FACILITATING EDUCATIONAL COURSES AND EVENTS IN LIBRARIES AND THROUGH LIBRARY OUTREACH
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 GOLDIESLIE ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B73 5PQ
- Phone:
- 07776160697
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window