Financial history Solihull Moors Foundation

Charity number: 1177282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.63k £184.80k £512.72k £734.11k £665.48k
Total expenditure £1.76k £30.70k £706.91k £832.78k £725.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £153.73k £269.70k £198.54k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £541.25k £645.80k £557.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £94.24k £72.49k £103.26k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.30k £15.82k £4.62k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £696.91k £824.78k £719.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £10.00k £8.00k £6.00k