THE TERRY FARRELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the knowledge and understanding of architecture and the built environment, creation of a study centre for architecture and built environment, creation of an archive to preserve and maintain public access to the work of Sir Terry Farrell and other leaders in the field of architecture and the built environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR TERRY FARRELL | Chair | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Molly Farrell-Earp | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
LUKE FARRELL | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lady MEI XIN WANG FARRELL | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.76k | £9.12k | £387 | £101.53k | £125.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.78k | £109.12k | £200.38k | £201.18k | £200.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 February 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 February 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2017 as amended on 26 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE CULTURE, HERITAGE AND EDUCATION THROUGH: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT; AND 3.1.2 THE ESTABLISHMENT OF : (A) A STUDY CENTRE FOR ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT; AND (B) AN ARCHIVE TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN AND PROVIDE PUBLIC ACCESS TO MATERIALS RELATING TO THE LIFE AND WORK OF SIR TERRY FARRELL CBE AND OTHER LEADERS IN THE FIELD OF ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL PAPERS, MODELS, DRAWINGS, PLANS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND OTHER ARTEFACTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farrell London Llp
7 Hatton Street
LONDON
NW8 8PL
- Phone:
- 02072583433
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window