CORNERSTONE UCKFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities including the celebration of public worship, the teaching of the Christian faith, mission and evangelism, pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved together with the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community and the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 21 September 2017: Standard registration
- CORNERSTONE CHURCH UCKFIELD (Working name)
- CORNERSTONE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Mark Jervis | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Helen Lane | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Melvin | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine House | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE WARREN | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN DOUGLAS WOOD | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT LANE | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|||||
CAROLE LESLEY MARCHANT | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY NIGEL HALLETT | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.56k | £33.90k | £66.04k | £26.07k | £42.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.67k | £43.56k | £39.85k | £51.88k | £34.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED ON 03 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cornerstone Church Uckfield
74 New Town
UCKFIELD
East Sussex
TN22 5AE
- Phone:
- 07876 275031
- Email:
- jeremyhallett59@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window