THE GUILDFORD SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings, talks and exhibitions held for members and the public. Makes occasional grants to other organisations. Helps conserve the heritage buildings and environment of the town. Informs members of developments in the town and surrounding area and comments on these to the Borough Council and participates in consultations. Produces an annual magazine and issues newsletters via the website
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 August 2017: CIO registration
- 07 May 2019: Funds received from 1169715 THE GUILDFORD SOCIETY
- GSOC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alistair Dermot Smith | Chair | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Harbor | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Adney Baylis | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barry Charles Williams | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Clive Allen | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Coleman | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH NAPP | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARY CAMERON | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.57k | £2.68k | £5.94k | £4.06k | £6.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.67k | £13.08k | £4.41k | £5.83k | £6.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE BOROUGH OF GUILDFORD: 1. TO PROTECT AND ENHANCE ITS BEAUTY AND AMENITY, AND TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST THEREIN. 2. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST. 4. TO PURSUE THESE PURPOSES BY MEANS OF MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, OTHER FORMS OF INSTRUCTION AND PUBLICITY, AND PROMOTION OF SCHEMES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Wodeland Avenue
GUILDFORD
GU2 4LD
- Phone:
- 01483503172
- Email:
- info@guildfordsociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window