THE ARTS SOCIETY STRATFORD UPON AVON.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Member of The Arts Society. Arts-based lectures in Stratford-upon-Avon given by approved lecturers. Day visits to museums, galleries etc, extended visits within UK and abroad. Church Recording and Heritage Volunteer teams for projects to preserve UK's historic heritage. Grants made to local organisations for completing arts projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 26 February 2018: Standard registration
- STRADFAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Triggs | Chair | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA JUNE MUSGRAVE | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
RAYMOND REGINALD DRURY | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Johnson | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Hughes | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MILLIKEN | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.62k | £23.01k | £28.07k | £27.66k | £36.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.69k | £18.10k | £25.04k | £25.99k | £33.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOV 2017 as amended on 15 Nov 2018 as amended on 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY SHALL HAVE AS ITS OBJECTS THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS, AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE PRESERVATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM'S NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Maudslay House
Woodland Drive
Great Alne
ALCESTER
Warwicks
- Phone:
- 01789488049
- Email:
- trusteeD@stradfas.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window