SOUTHEND-ON-SEA SAMARITANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable persons in Southend-on-Sea and the surrounding area as well as elsewhere who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, to receive confidential emotional support at any time of the day or night in order to improve their emotional health and to reduce the incidence of suicide. Contact is made by phone, SMS, Email and face-to-face.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 18 April 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Sutton | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emer Marie Meadway | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosa Garner | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ray Michael Turner | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Constance Downs | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Jennings | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Julia Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Hawkins | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Isabelle Bailey | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.52k | £132.54k | £177.64k | £81.64k | £162.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.97k | £52.92k | £59.31k | £98.71k | £156.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE PERSONS IN SOUTHEND-ON-SEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS WELL AS ELSEWHERE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING FEELINGS OF DISTRESS OR DESPAIR, INCLUDING THOSE WHO MAY BE AT RISK OF SUICIDE, TO RECEIVE CONFIDENTIAL EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AT ANY TIME OF THE DAY OR NIGHT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND TO REDUCE THE INCIDENCE OF SUICIDE; TO PROMOTE A BETTER UNDERSTANDING IN SOCIETY OF SUICIDE, SUICIDAL BEHAVIOUR AND THE VALUE OF EXPRESSING FEELINGS WHICH MAY OTHERWISE LEAD TO SUICIDE OR IMPAIRED EMOTIONAL HEALTH; AND TO COLLABORATE WITH AND SUPPORT SAMARITANS CENTRAL CHARITY AND ITS AFFILIATED BRANCHES IN FULFILLING THESE OBJECTS.
Linked charities
- 18 April 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4
Beaumont Court
61-71 Victoria Avenue
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS2 6EB
- Phone:
- 07900 552015
- Email:
- southendsams@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window