SAMARITANS OF PRESTON AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1173718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To work for the assistance of persons who are suicidal, despairing or in distress by providing a service primarily intended for the benefit of persons in Preston and the surrounding area (but without specific limitation as to area) to enable such persons to receive immediate help, compassion and befriending from members of the Charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £136,485
Total expenditure: £15,532

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 September 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • PRESTON SAMARITANS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Helen Jackson Chair 13 January 2020
None on record
Dr MARTIN JOHN WHEATMAN Trustee 30 January 2025
THE SHEPHERD STREET TRUST
Received: On time
Janet Anderson Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Grant Walker Trustee 27 October 2024
None on record
Mary Doran Trustee 27 October 2024
None on record
Michael Morgan Trustee 25 November 2023
None on record
Michael Bowerman Trustee 10 December 2022
None on record
Rebecca Wenham Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.85k £50.30k £126.66k £43.87k £136.49k
Total expenditure £36.60k £42.23k £46.75k £69.97k £15.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.86k £24.18k £5.65k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 1975, 10 MARCH 1983 AND 27 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN PRESTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND (B) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
PRESTON AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS
Registration history
  • 19 September 1970 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Samaritans of Preston & District
Unit 9 Navigation Business Village
Navigation Way
Ashton-On-Ribble
PRESTON
PR2 2YP
Phone:
01772259000