POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL/POLSKA SZKOLA SOBOTNIA MILFORD IM. TADEUSZA CZUCHNICKIEGO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of young people between the ages of 3 to 18 years old in Surrey and North Hampshire and the surrounding areas, in Polish language, literature, geography,history,culture, tradition and Christian values
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 November 2017: Standard registration
- POLSKA SZKOLA SOBOTNIA MILFORD IM. TADEUSZA CZUCHNICKIEGO (Working name)
- POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL MILFORD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antonina Machowska MA | Chair | 30 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Stephen Blaszczyk - Brooks | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Magdalena Swidniewicz | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emilia Kojtych-Plawska | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justyna Borucka | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MALGORZATA WOJTYNKA-SIMS M.SC | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr WOJCIECH MACHOWSKI | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.72k | £50.86k | £42.71k | £66.25k | £71.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.28k | £30.95k | £46.34k | £49.22k | £52.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2017 as amended on 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 3.5 AND 18 YEARS IN SURREY, NORTH HAMPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN POLISH LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, CULTURE, TRADITION AND CHRISTIAN VALUES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Admirals Court
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU1 2PQ
- Phone:
- 07894 314102
- Email:
- at.machowska@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window