THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITTON

Charity number: 1176182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC exists to support the overall mission and ministry for the Church of England in the Parish, by the provision of services and church buildings and facilities as places of worship and in support of community activities such as concerts. Our churches are: St Michael, Aldbourne; St Michael, Axford; St Nicholas, Baydon; St Mary, Chilton Foliat; All Saints, Froxfield; and Holy Cross, Ramsbury.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £293,539
Total expenditure: £277,375

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 December 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WHITTON PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Susan Elizabeth Hutton Chair 19 November 2020
THE EDWARD ROBERT POLE AND SIR FELIX JOHN CLEWETT POLE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
MRS RACHEL GOLDSMITH CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
SIDNEY GEORGE CHAMBERLAIN GOODWILL TRUST
Received: On time
LANFEAR EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SYLVIA MATHER CHARITY
Received: On time
Jonathan Andrew William Rose Trustee 17 May 2023
MRS RACHEL GOLDSMITH CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Peter Michael Ball Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Veronica Anne Bourne Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Joanna Margaret Hobart Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Peter Nicholas Chambers Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Robert John Beveridge Smart Trustee 21 October 2020
THE SYLVIA MATHER CHARITY
Received: On time
Philip Paul Trickey Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Krystyna Helena Hagerty Trustee 24 April 2017
MRS RACHEL GOLDSMITH CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
PENELOPE RUTH WILLIAMS Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
MRS JAN HEPPENSTALL Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
BRENDA WING SHIK WONG ROBINSON Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
Dr DAVID CECIL ROBINSON Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
ELIZABETH ORCHARD Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
PETER CHARLES CAMFIELD Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £371.72k £238.35k £295.13k £245.19k £293.54k
Total expenditure £353.42k £269.55k £290.75k £258.67k £277.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.20k £9.36k £750 £1.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TEAM OFFICE - CHURCH ROOMS
BACK LANE
RAMSBURY
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 2QH
Phone:
01672520963