Financial history MOLD MISSION AREA

Charity number: 1176095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £281.08k £415.78k £283.56k £385.41k £425.18k
Total expenditure £295.59k £371.29k £317.13k £427.46k £356.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.35k £5.25k £3.00k N/A £4.40k