Financial history THE EXARCHATE PARISH OF ST AIDAN & ST CHAD, NOTTINGHAM ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN PROPERTY TRUST DEED

Charity number: 1174715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.81k £8.07k £7.11k £8.09k £9.30k
Total expenditure £4.79k £4.03k £6.44k £6.97k £7.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A