ALLERDALE DISABILITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information service giving advice and support on any disability related issue to people with disabilities, their families and carers. A large proportion of the work involves assisting people to complete welfare benefit forms. Drop In Centre for physically disabled adults and their carers, providing social and learning opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 October 1980: Standard registration
- THE ALLERDALE ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID BROWN BSC, CPA | Chair |
|
||||||
Martin John Woodham | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mounsey | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Corlett | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Carey | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Konrad Joseph Henry Hansen | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Markley | Trustee | 24 August 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.65k | £62.08k | £56.30k | £99.09k | £91.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.89k | £50.89k | £62.21k | £86.56k | £77.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.43k | £40.63k | £25.96k | £22.22k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1989 7 NOVEMBER 1992, 26 OCTOBER 1996, 16 MAY 1998, 12 MAY 2001 AND 11 NOVEMBER 2003 as amended on 25 May 2018 as amended on 25 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DISABLED PEOPLE WITHIN ALLERDALE AND WEST COAST DISTRICT IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE AFOREGOING (1) TO CO-OPERATE WITH VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS IN ORDER TO CO-ORDINATE THEIR ACTIVITIES RELATING TO DISABLED PEOPLE (2) TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION RELATING TO DISABLED PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
ALLERDALE AND WEST COAST DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moorclose Community Centre
Needham Drive
WORKINGTON
CA14 3SE
- Phone:
- 0190061912
- Email:
- people@adanet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window