CHAIYA TRUST

Charity number: 1176237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To uncover, promote and reward gifted artists looking to explore and express spirituality and faith through their creativity. To display this art to new and existing audiences interested in spirituality, faith and art.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £501

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATRINA MOSS Chair 12 December 2017
None on record
RICHARD WARD Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Jordan Martindale Trustee 28 January 2019
None on record
Ann Clifford Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.64k £19.61k £23.68k £24.16k £0
Total expenditure £10.63k £32.21k £25.72k £37.69k £501
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 02 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FOLLYS END
EVERTON ROAD
HORDLE
LYMINGTON
SO41 0HE
Phone:
07939501228