MANY MINDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Many Minds works with individuals to engage with their creativity, improve confidence, self-esteem and build social skills and networks. We run weekly workshops in theatre making skills to devise and create high quality contemporary performance. Many Minds also delivers mentoring, training and consultancy using performance as a tool to improve wellbeing, increase understanding and reduce stigma.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Newman | Chair | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malaika Florence Kegode | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelina McClelland | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Rose Rodney | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANDY MASTERS | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.05k | £115.67k | £116.53k | £191.44k | £91.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.04k | £73.71k | £118.03k | £172.93k | £106.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.80k | £23.87k | £17.60k | £47.20k | £3.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND THOSE AT RISK OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS IN ORDER TO INCREASE AWARENESS, UNDERSTANDING AND REDUCE STIGMA OF MENTAL HEALTH TO THE WIDER PUBLIC THROUGH CREATIVE ACTIVITIES, PERFORMANCE AND PROFESSIONAL THEATRE PRODUCTIONS, TO IMPROVE ACCESS TO ARTS AND OTHER MAINSTREAM SERVICES FOR MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIPS TO RAISE AWARENESS AND REDUCE BARRIERS TO ACCESS AND TO IMPROVE CONFIDENCE, SELF-ESTEEM, SOCIAL NETWORKS AND PROGRESSION IN TO EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT FOR MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS AND THOSE AT RISK THROUGH INVOLVEMENT IN CREATIVE ACTIVITIES AND MENTORING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 CHELSEA PARK
BRISTOL
BS5 6AG
- Phone:
- 07843210272
- Email:
- info@many-minds.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window