THE TRIANGLE COMMUNITY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

31 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 31 August 2017: Standard registration
- THE TRIANGLE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
31 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Kasema | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Kevin Charles Durkin | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Durkin | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Flavio Gustavo Mazini | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Stott | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Robb | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Clark | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Kenyon | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kenyon | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Clark | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Don Astley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jermyn | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CRITCHLEY | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN MASSEY | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ESTELLE BUCKLEY | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRIAN SMITH | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
FIONA Elizabeth GORTON | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LAYCOCK BA | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN MARTIN MB CHB | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Haslam | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
SHEILA NELSON | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
COLIN NELSON | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID STUART WHITTLE BA Hons | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
GLENNYS ASTLEY JP, BA | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR MASSEY | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE READ | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE MASLIVEC BSC | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER HASLAM | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.70k | £56.17k | £99.19k | £126.48k | £133.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.62k | £104.97k | £127.62k | £120.90k | £146.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED ON UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF: (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Triangle Methodist Church
New Church Road
BOLTON
BL1 5QP
- Phone:
- 01204845917
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
thetrianglechurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window