Financial history ACKWORTH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1175704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.29m £7.87m £8.02m £8.32m £9.02m
Total expenditure £8.02m £7.91m £8.39m £9.10m £8.94m
Income from government contracts £800.00k £1.12m £1.20m £1.32m N/A
Income from government grants £363.53k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £52.43k £70.58k £75.63k £57.13k £58.10k
Income - Other trading activities £73.25k £131.53k £219.86k £249.26k £236.43k
Income - Charitable activities £7.79m £7.36m £7.71m £7.98m £8.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.67k £11.76k £14.18k £32.26k £38.53k
Income - Other £363.53k £294.02k £1.93k £0 £4.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.67m £7.71m £8.17m £8.78m £8.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £346.41k £203.59k £220.53k £315.06k £273.32k
Expenditure - Governance £15.75k £51.31k £53.38k £50.92k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0