SIGHTBOX TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we are providing Sightboxes for Visually impaired children in the 3rd world countries to help go a long way in education and segregation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- British Virgin Islands
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 06 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pa Modou Manneh | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Ellis | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.11k | £10.07k | £13.81k | £6.45k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £11.83k | £11.22k | £9.11k | £4.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | 07 July 2020 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED CHILDREN LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY BY PROVIDING A SIGHTBOX CONTAINING ASSISTING TECHNOLGIES TO DEVELOP ESSENTIAL SKILLS FOR EDUCATION AND FUTURE EMPLOYMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 HEATHFIELD COURT
FIRTREE GROVE
WHITBY
ELLESMERE PORT
CH66 2QT
- Phone:
- 07525145524
- Email:
- ENQUIRE@SIGHTBOXTRUST.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.sightboxtrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window