Financial history SEVERN ARTS

Charity number: 1180335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.15m £1.82m £2.58m £2.58m £3.46m
Total expenditure £2.03m £1.94m £2.59m £2.51m £3.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.15m £1.24m £881.88k £1.64m £1.67m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.21m £1.25m £1.79m £1.72m £1.99m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £942.31k £335.18k £759.46k £865.09k £1.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £1.52k £20.47k
Income - Other £0 £236.64k £24.75k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.03m £0 £2.59m £2.51m £3.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £5.69k £5.86k £5.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.94m £0 £0 £0