Financial history THE YAMEN EDWARD NISSIM FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1176117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £127.10k £163.91k £241.54k £128.37k £114.00k
Total expenditure £127.33k £150.04k £243.16k £131.40k £118.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A