Trustees BLOOMSBURY CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1174891

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DR SIMON WOODMAN | Chair | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH GARDINER | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maya Ursula Udoka Okonkwo | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Clifford | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fifi Oliver Evelyn | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Streeter | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Redford | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD BROWN | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.