Financial history GREENWICH MUSIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1176649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £242.90k £305.31k £382.26k £458.08k £548.94k
Total expenditure £216.60k £284.03k £388.47k £476.21k £537.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k £12.67k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £544.23k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £525.07k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.79k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.08k