PEMBROKE COLLEGE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1177866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pembroke House was founded in 1885 by students from Pembroke College Cambridge. It is based in Walworth, Southwark. We are home to a wide-range of activities for the local community and together with local residents, groups and organisations, we're building a Walworth in which people can connect, learn from one another, and work together towards a good society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PEMBROKE COLLEGE MISSION (Working name)
  • PEMBROKE HOUSE (Working name)
  • PEMBROKE HOUSE WALWORTH (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORD SMITH Chair 26 January 2017
PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION
Received: On time
CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND
Received: On time
Di'Mario Downer Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Carol Anne Hustler Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Theophilia Shaw Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Professor Stephani Louise Hatch Trustee 15 November 2022
FOUNDATION FOR THE SOCIOLOGY OF HEALTH AND ILLNESS
Received: On time
Peter Ntiamoah Baffoe Trustee 15 November 2022
PEABODY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
COUNCILLOR MICHAEL MITCHELL Trustee 09 April 2018
A PARTNER IN EDUCATION
Received: On time
TRINITY IN CAMBERWELL
Received: On time
ROOTS AND SHOOTS
Received: On time
JOHN NEVIN Trustee 26 January 2017
PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION
Received: On time
SCENE AND HEARD
Received: On time
Rev Eleanor Mary Goodison Trustee 26 January 2017
WAVENEY FOODBANK
Received: On time
PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION
Received: On time
Loraine Gelsthorpe Trustee 26 January 2017
PROBATION INSTITUTE
Received: On time
THE ISAAC NEWTON TRUST
Recently registered
ANDREW WILLIAM MORRIS Trustee 26 January 2017
CAMBRIDGE EARLY MUSIC
Received: On time
Dr JAMES GARDOM Trustee 26 January 2017
None on record
Dr TIMOTHY JOHN FORSE Trustee 26 January 2017
PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.43m £903.19k £847.87k £963.18k £1.10m
Total expenditure £691.42k £779.06k £857.77k £1.01m £928.45k
Income from government contracts N/A £6.30k N/A N/A £35.39k
Income from government grants £22.67k £162.43k £78.15k £252.43k £250.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.39m £417.13k £387.18k £380.42k £336.35k
Income - Other trading activities £8.80k £17.32k £28.33k £17.86k £57.54k
Income - Charitable activities £252.55k £420.79k £360.35k £490.00k £616.13k
Income - Endowments £1.27m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.52k £47.95k £72.01k £74.90k £85.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £617.73k £689.10k £730.30k £895.80k £822.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.69k £89.96k £127.47k £112.88k £105.99k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £21.62k £7.25k £6.99k £18.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.23m £1.19m £1.20m £1.16m £1.15m
Long-term investments £1.48m £1.59m £1.63m £2.29m £2.31m
Other assets £374.97k £567.10k £630.86k £539.52k £670.50k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £89.87k £118.92k £211.12k £139.92k £99.68k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PEMBROKE HOUSE
80 TATUM STREET
LONDON
SE17 1QR
Phone:
02077033803