THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITEHAWK

Charity number: 1175527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- Regular public worship open to all. - Pastoral work, including running Foodbank, recovery, debt advice and visiting the sick and the bereaved. - Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for youth, children as well as parents and toddlers. - Mission giving to other charities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £273,913
Total expenditure: £361,131

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 November 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST CUTHMAN'S WHITEHAWK PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachael Spiring Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Isabella Hart Trustee 23 March 2025
None on record
Archie Henderson Trustee 23 March 2025
None on record
Dr Audrey Gupta Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Rev Daniel Millest Trustee 02 September 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRIGHTON, ST PETER
Received: On time
SPEAR BRIGHTON TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
ST PAUL'S THEOLOGICAL CENTRE
Received: On time
Rev Benedict Alexander Atkins Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Margaret Morling Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record
Luke Atkins Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record
LESLIE TAYLOR Trustee 27 April 2017
SPEAR BRIGHTON TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £254.26k £285.85k £278.82k £256.63k £273.91k
Total expenditure £178.88k £211.17k £241.63k £258.73k £361.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Cuthmans Church
Whitehawk Way
BRIGHTON
BN2 5HE
Phone:
01273 602899