CHUMS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mental health and emotional wellbeing support services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- CHUMS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Carter | Chair | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
SHARON KNOTT | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Jenny Coles CBE | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Kevin McNamara | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Hannah Touhey | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jessica Margaret Ann Costanzo | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
DAWN HEWITT | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £449.84k | £426.52k | £357.36k | £540.75k | £448.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £415.95k | £407.80k | £350.26k | £550.57k | £468.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £463.99k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £76.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £359.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £190.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £356.43k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AFFECTED BY BEREAVEMENT, TRAUMA AND OTHER EMOTIONAL AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chums
Wrest Park Enterprise Centre
Wrest Park
Silsoe
BEDFORD
MK45 4HS
- Phone:
- 01525863924
- Email:
- sue.clarke@chumscharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window