AMESBURY HISTORY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by the establishment and maintenance of a museum and associated artefacts relating to the history of Amesbury and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,560 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Langhurst | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Jane Laughlin | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelea Rosamund Bayliss | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Harrod | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jason DOIG | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Edward Johnston | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER KENWARD | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA GANE | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.98k | £17.17k | £1.51k | £42 | £29.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.96k | £3.27k | £3.01k | £6.68k | £39.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.45k | N/A | N/A | £2.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND ASSOCIATED ARTEFACTS RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF AMESBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amesbury History Centre
4 Church Street
AMESBURY
Wiltshire
SP4 7EU
- Phone:
- 07533749456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window