SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY

Charity number: 1176241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity advances the Christian religion for the public benefit by training and preparing ministers for reformed churches. Training is undertaken at Grove House in Salisbury and in the student's home church. Virtually all training at Grove House is provided by trustees who receive no fees for their services. It is therefore a Seminary for ministers provided by ministers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £14,955
Total expenditure: £9,520

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MALCOLM HUBERT WATTS Chair 11 December 2017
None on record
Rev John Thackway Trustee 11 December 2017
None on record
GEORGE ROLAND BURROWS Trustee 11 December 2017
THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN HERITAGE TRUST UK
Received: On time
RICHARD ALAN CLARKE Trustee 11 December 2017
THE TRINITARIAN BIBLE SOCIETY
Received: On time
BEACON PARK BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
CARE SRI LANKA
Received: On time
Rev DEWI WYN HIGHAM Trustee 11 December 2017
THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST
Received: On time
TABERNACLE CARDIFF
Received: 14 days late
Pooyan Mehrshahi Trustee 11 December 2017
THE BIBLE LEAGUE TRUST
Received: On time
PROVIDENCE BAPTIST CHAPEL, CHELTENHAM
Received: On time
THE PROTESTANT TRUTH SOCIETY (INC)
Received: On time
Rev NEIL VICTOR PFEIFFER Trustee 11 December 2017
THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST
Received: On time
Rev DAVID WILLIAM KAY Trustee 11 December 2017
WHIDDON VALLEY EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST
Received: On time
Rev JOHN MALCOLM SAUNDERS Trustee 11 December 2017
PROVIDENCE CHAPEL, CHICHESTER
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher John Buss Trustee 11 December 2017
GRACE REFORMED BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.08k £15.01k £15.89k £10.62k £14.96k
Total expenditure £11.69k £9.36k £11.31k £12.89k £9.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
89 Trelawney Road
Peverell
PLYMOUTH
PL3 4JY
Phone:
07762 183581
Website:

salisburyseminary.org