Financial history LIVERPOOL TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND

Charity Number: 510886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.03k £1.92k £4.76k £983 £1.81k
Total expenditure £2.80k £324 £585 £500 £326
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A