1ST GRANGE AND CARTMEL SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the group are as a unit of the Scout Association. The method of achieving the Aim of the Association is by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training, based on the Scout Promise and Law and guided by adult leadership. Main activities in relation to these objects:The main activities for the young people in membership consist of: Weekly Section Meetings .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 February 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Welburn | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Bennett | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thomas Pearson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda McCleery | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LEADER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.61k | £22.53k | £14.76k | £11.44k | £14.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.05k | £14.45k | £7.10k | £15.99k | £17.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLE OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Croft
Flookburgh
GRANGE-OVER-SANDS
Cumbria
LA11 7NF
- Phone:
- 07795613821
- Email:
- GandC.Scouts@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window