Financial history BIRMINGHAM PEN TRADE HERITAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1176955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.20k £72.39k £135.27k £54.75k £66.79k
Total expenditure £70.50k £61.50k £76.68k £82.41k £87.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £120.64k N/A N/A