Trustees BIRMINGHAM PEN TRADE HERITAGE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1176955

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Amy Shute | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver John Buckley | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Edmondson | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Steven Hearn | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carmel Girling | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David Evans | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Casebourne Munro | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.