SOUTHERN CROSS EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of worship - evangelical free church at 103 Trafalgar Road, Portslade, BN41 1GU. Youth groups, please see our website, prayer meeting/Bible study, please see our website
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 31 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE HAYWARD | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|||||
BRENDA ANN GATES | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON TESTER | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE MARY VOAK | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.07k | £39.72k | £33.37k | £44.57k | £39.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.11k | £29.14k | £28.49k | £41.05k | £43.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN PORTSLADE, BRIGHTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2.SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTHERN CROSS EVANGELICAL CHURCH
103 TRAFALGAR ROAD
PORTSLADE
BRIGHTON
BN41 1GU
- Phone:
- 01273232815
- Email:
- southern.cross@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window