Kwinella Diaspora Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help young people especially but not exclusively through educational, recreational and sporting activities so as to develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society of those living in the UK. We promote social inclusion for the public benefit among migrants who are socially excluded on grounds of their ethnic origin, religion, believe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- The Gambia
Governance
- 04 May 2018: CIO registration
- KWINELLA ASSOCIATION UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Mara | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
FATOU JAMMEH | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KELUNTANG SANYANG | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMADOU SABALLY | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nuha Ceesay | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.51k | £1.25k | £1.66k | £1.59k | £2.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £910 | £1.56k | £2.48k | £350 | £819 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 May 2018 as amended on 13 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF KWINELLA ASSOCIATION ARE 1. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY OF THOSE LIVING IN THE UK. 2. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG MIGRANTS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEVE OR CREED OR THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING: A) ADVOCACY, INFORMATION AND ADVICE; B) EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND SUPPORT WITH LITERACY AND NUMERACY; C) RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF GAMBIA BY ORGANISING EVENTS 4. TO RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY OF KWINELLA IN THE GAMBIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL EDUCATION), TRAINING AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 GRAYRIGG CLOSE
LEEDS
LS15 0DF
- Phone:
- 07856072596
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window