John Moores Painting Prize Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of an exhibition of contemporary painting or other visual art, currently every two years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
- China
Governance
- 24 February 1981: Standard registration
- JOHN MOORES EXHIBITIONS (Working name)
- JOHN MOORES LIVERPOOL EXHIBITION (Working name)
- THE JOHN MOORES LIVERPOOL EXHIBITION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nadia Moores | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pickstone | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Power | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lord John Grantchester | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Juan Cruz | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor LingMin | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
LEWIS BIGGS OBE | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN AINSCOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNA LOUISE VAZQUEZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARNABY MOORES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.60k | £96.70k | £29.29k | £33.77k | £45.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.35k | £52.92k | £37.93k | £99.16k | £55.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1981 as amended on 02 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ART BY SPONSORING PROMOTING OR IN ANY OTHER MANNER ASSISTING IN THE PROMOTION OF AN EXHIBITION OR EXHIBITIONS OF CONTEMPORARY PAINTING OR OTHER VISUAL ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suites C
D
E & F
14th floor
The Plaza
100 Old
- Phone:
- 01512361494
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window