Financial history 1ST SARISBURY GREEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1177309
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.75k £36.59k £48.66k £50.01k £48.53k
Total expenditure £45.70k £24.46k £40.31k £49.91k £49.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £10.67k N/A N/A