Snape Maltings

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to promote and assist in the advancement of education in the arts and crafts and, for so long as Snape Maltings (Registered Charity: 261383) remains in existence and not be in liquidation or administration or receivership or have ceased to be a registered charity, to support its activities by providing financial assistance and the use of property and facilities to it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 June 2018: Standard registration
- Britten Pears Arts (Previous name)
- SNAPE MALTINGS ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
- The Benjamin Britten Foundation Limited (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Young | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2016 as amended on 20 Mar 2019 as amended on 06 Nov 2019 as amended on 14 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS AND, IN PARTICULAR, FOR SO LONG AS SNAPE MALTINGS (REGISTERED CHARITY: 261383) SHALL REMAIN IN EXISTENCE, AND NOT BE IN LIQUIDATION OR ADMINISTRATION OR RECEIVERSHIP OR HAVE CEASED TO BE A REGISTERED CHARITY, TO SUPPORT ITS ACTIVITIES BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND THE USE OF PROPERTY AND FACILITIES TO IT. IN THE EVENT THAT IT CEASES TO BE PRACTICABLE TO SUPPORT SNAPE MALTINGS THEN TO ACT SO FAR AS POSSIBLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS OF SNAPE MALTINGS AS THEY EXIST IMMEDIATELY PRIOR TO SUCH EVENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SNAPE MALTINGS CONCERT HALL
SNAPE BRIDGE
SNAPE
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 1SP
- Phone:
- 01728687103
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window