Financial history THE ARTS SOCIETY OXFORD

Charity Number: 1175875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £43.95k £40.39k £34.75k £39.73k £42.30k
Total expenditure £42.57k £22.31k £39.34k £51.74k £42.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A