THE VOLUNTARY SOLIDARITY FUND INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The VSF's mission is to provide an opportunity for the more fortunate in society to help those who are disadvantaged by contributing financially and by volunteering time. The VSF promotes existing charities and individual initiatives in developed countries which strive to bring marginalized individuals and families into society. Support is in the form of Board approved grants and/or loans.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JOSEF BONNICI | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Melchior Von Muraly | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Jose Subiela Alvarez | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Msgr. Claudio Maria Celli | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Pierre Casey | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCO VANNI D'ARCHIRAFI | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Lord Daniel Joseph Brennan | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL PETER BRAY | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Count LORENZO ROSSI DI MONTELERA | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PASCAL LUCIEN DUVAL | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR DOMINGO BICKEL | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.80k | £32.73k | £29.02k | £66.30k | £43.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £35.28k | £20.39k | £40.09k | £40.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, RELIGION OR GENDER, AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY DETERMINE, TO INCLUDE IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE FOLLOWING: (I) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, AND BY SUPPORTING ACTIONS AND PROGRAMS AIMED AT INTEGRATING AS WELL AS REINTEGRATING INTO SOCIETY THOSE WHO HAVE ALREADY BECOME SOCIALLY EXCLUDED; (II) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE, OR ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING DEPRIVED OR SOCIALLY EXCLUDED; (IV) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, POOR EDUCATION OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT, HOMELESSNESS OR POOR HOUSING, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS, NO OTHER PURPOSES. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE FUND'S PROPERTY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARRER & CO
65-66 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LH
- Phone:
- 07456273351
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window