CAMSMILE (CAMBRIDGE SMILE)

Charity number: 1178765
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting cleft lip and/or palate services in the East of England and in the developing world and elsewhere overseas as decided by the trustees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £5,142
Total expenditure: £1,987

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Hertfordshire
  • Leicester City
  • Luton
  • Milton Keynes
  • Norfolk
  • Northamptonshire
  • Peterborough City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 June 2018: Standard registration
  • 12 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 12 April 2021: Funds transferred to 1091316 OPERATION SMILE UNITED KINGDOM
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.43k £5.14k
Total expenditure £1.95k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required